VA HB2399 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Multi-jurisdiction grand jury; hate crimes. Adds the following to the list of crimes that a multi-jurisdiction grand jury may investigate: (i) simple assault or assault and battery where the victim was intentionally selected because of his race, religious conviction, color, or national origin; (ii) entering the property of another for purposes of damaging such property or its contents or interfering with the rights of the owner, user, or occupant where such property was intentionally selected because of the race, religious conviction, color, or national origin of the owner, user, or occupant; and (iii) various offenses that tend to cause violence.
Title
Hate crimes; adds to list of crimes that a multi-jurisdiction grand jury may investigate.
Sponsors
Sen. Lamont Bagby [D] | Sen. Jennifer Boysko [D] | Del. Mark Dudenhefer [R] | Del. Delores McQuinn [D] |
Del. Kenneth Plum [D] | Del. Sam Rasoul [D] | Del. Marcus Simon [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-07 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2017-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2017-01-24 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law |
2017-01-18 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2017-01-18 | House | Presented and ordered printed 17104114D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+HB2399 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB2399+hil |