VA HB2398 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-08 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-08 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Industrial hemp; pilot program; license. Directs the Commissioner of Agriculture and Consumer Services to establish a pilot program to study and grow industrial hemp and to create a license for such program. The license is valid for three years and the application fee for such license shall not exceed $75. The bill removes the authority of the Board of Agriculture and Consumer Services to adopt regulations to license persons to grow industrial hemp.
Title
Industrial hemp; pilot program to study growth, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-08 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2017-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2017-02-01 | House | Assigned App. sub: Commerce, Agriculture, Natural Resources and Technology |
2017-02-01 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2017-02-01 | House | Committee substitute printed 17104701D-H1 |
2017-02-01 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (21-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2017-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 2-N) |
2017-01-23 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Agriculture |
2017-01-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2017-01-18 | House | Presented and ordered printed 17104083D |