VA HB2395 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Requires 27 affirmative votes to override Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on March 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Requires 27 affirmative votes to override Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Public works contracts; prevailing wage provisions. Prohibits state agencies from requiring bidders, offerors, contractors, or subcontractors to pay, or require the payment of, wages, salaries, benefits, or other remuneration to persons employed to perform services in connection with a public works project at a rate that is based on the wages and benefits prevailing for the corresponding classes of laborers and mechanics employed. A corresponding prohibition is made applicable to state agencies providing grants or other financial assistance for public works projects, unless otherwise required by federal law. The measure further states that it is the policy of the Commonwealth not to implement, adopt, enforce, or require any program, policy, or provision that requires a public works contract that requires the payment of wages or other remuneration at a rate based on the prevailing wage, whether modeled on the federal Davis-Bacon Act or on a similar law of another state.
Title
Public works contracts; prevailing wage provisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Senate sustained Governor's veto (22-Y 18-N) (Y: 22 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - House: VOTE: OVERRIDE GOVERNOR'S VETO #2 (68-Y 31-N) (Y: 70 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - House: VOTE: OVERRIDE GOVERNOR'S VETO (67-Y 31-N) (Y: 69 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (21-Y 18-N) (Y: 21 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (67-Y 32-N) (Y: 69 N: 32 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendment (15-Y 6-N) (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (3-Y 1-N) (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-15 - House - House: VOTE: OVERRIDE GOVERNOR'S VETO #2 (68-Y 31-N) (Y: 70 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - House: VOTE: OVERRIDE GOVERNOR'S VETO (67-Y 31-N) (Y: 69 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (21-Y 18-N) (Y: 21 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (67-Y 32-N) (Y: 69 N: 32 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendment (15-Y 6-N) (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (3-Y 1-N) (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-15 | Senate | Requires 27 affirmative votes to override Governor's veto |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Senate sustained Governor's veto (22-Y 18-N) |
2015-04-15 | House | VOTE: OVERRIDE GOVERNOR'S VETO #2 (68-Y 31-N) |
2015-04-15 | House | Governor's veto overridden (68-Y 31-N) |
2015-04-15 | House | Reconsideration of Governor's veto agreed to by House |
2015-04-15 | House | VOTE: OVERRIDE GOVERNOR'S VETO (67-Y 31-N) |
2015-04-15 | House | Governor's veto overridden (67-Y 31-N) |
2015-04-14 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-03-27 | Governor: Vetoed by Governor | |
2015-03-10 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-03-10 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/10/15 |
2015-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-03-06 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2395ER) |
2015-03-06 | House | Enrolled |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Passed Senate (21-Y 18-N) |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Read third time |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (8-Y 7-N) |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2015-02-10 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (67-Y 32-N) |
2015-02-10 | House | Read third time and passed House (67-Y 32-N) |
2015-02-09 | House | Printed as engrossed 15102289D-E |
2015-02-09 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB2395E |
2015-02-09 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2015-02-09 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-07 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-05 | House | Reported from General Laws with amendment (15-Y 6-N) |
2015-02-05 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (3-Y 1-N) |
2015-01-28 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2015-01-23 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2015-01-23 | House | Presented and ordered printed 15102289D |