VA HB2394 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-22 - Chair votes No
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-22 - Chair votes No
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Pawnbrokers; allowable late fees. Provides that a pawnbroker may charge a late fee, not to exceed 10 percent of the amount loaned, for each item that is not claimed by the pledged due date.
Title
Pawnbrokers; allowable late fees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Defeated by Senate (20-Y 20-N) (Y: 20 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of defeated action agreed to by Senate (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Defeated by Senate (20-Y 20-N) (Y: 20 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (63-Y 34-N) (Y: 63 N: 34 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (12-Y 7-N) (Y: 12 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of defeated action agreed to by Senate (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Defeated by Senate (20-Y 20-N) (Y: 20 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (63-Y 34-N) (Y: 63 N: 34 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (12-Y 7-N) (Y: 12 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-22 | Senate | Chair votes No |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Defeated by Senate (20-Y 20-N) |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Reconsideration of defeated action agreed to by Senate (38-Y 1-N) |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Chair votes No |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Defeated by Senate (20-Y 20-N) |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (8-Y 7-N) |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2017-02-07 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (63-Y 34-N) |
2017-02-07 | House | Read third time and passed House (63-Y 34-N) |
2017-02-06 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2017-02-04 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-02 | House | Reported from General Laws (12-Y 7-N) |
2017-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 2-N) |
2017-01-23 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #4 |
2017-01-18 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2017-01-18 | House | Presented and ordered printed 17103922D |