VA HB2392 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Inquiry and report of immigration status; persons charged with or convicted of certain crimes; certain victims or witnesses of crimes. Removes provisions requiring (i) jail officers to ascertain the citizenship of any inmate taken into custody at a jail, (ii) probation and parole officers to inquire as to the citizenship status of an individual convicted of a felony in circuit court and referred to such officers, and (iii) officers in charge of correctional facilities to inquire as to the citizenship of any person committed to a correctional facility, and therefore such information is not required to be reported to the Central Criminal Records Exchange of the Department of State Police. The bill also removes the mandatory duty of the clerk of a court committing a convicted alien to a correctional facility to furnish related court records to a United States immigration officer and the requirement that an intake officer report to the Bureau of Immigration and Customs Enforcement of the U.S. Department of Homeland Security any juvenile detained on an allegation that the juvenile, believed to be in the United States illegally, committed a violent felony. The bill prohibits officers or agents of any state or local law-enforcement agency from inquiring into the immigration status of a person who is (a) a victim of a crime, (b) a parent or guardian of a minor victim of a crime, (c) a person who is a cooperating witness in the investigation of a crime, or (d) the parent or guardian of a minor witness to a crime.
Title
Inquiry and report of immigration status; persons charged with or convicted of certain crimes.
Sponsors
Del. Alfonso Lopez [D] | Sen. Lashrecse Aird [D] | Del. Hala Ayala [D] | Del. Patrick Hope [D] |
Del. Chris Hurst [D] | Del. Jerrauld Jones [D] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] | Del. Mark Levine [D] |
Del. Kenneth Plum [D] | Sen. Danica Roem [D] | Del. Marcus Simon [D] | Del. Richard Sullivan [D] |
Del. Kathy Tran [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2019-01-16 | House | Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 3-N) |
2019-01-15 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2019-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19104128D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 1 | 309.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 11.02 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 294.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 83.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
53 | 1 | 218 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
53 | 1 | 219 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
53 | 1 | 220.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
53 | 1 | 220.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |