VA HB2391 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0676)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0676)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Allocation of highway funds by the Commonwealth Transportation Board. Provides that the five percent of moneys currently allocated annually by the Commonwealth Transportation Board for paving unpaved highways carrying more than 50 vehicles per day will instead be allocated for paving or improving such highways. The bill has a delayed effective date of July 1, 2016.
Title
Highway funds; allocation by the Commonwealth Transportation Board.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 3-N) (Y: 99 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-27 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0676) | |
2015-03-27 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 676 (effective 7/1/16) | |
2015-03-10 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-03-10 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/10/15 |
2015-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-03-06 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2391ER) |
2015-03-06 | House | Enrolled |
2015-02-24 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 3-N) |
2015-02-24 | House | Senate amendment agreed to by House (97-Y 3-N) |
2015-02-24 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Read third time |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Reported from Transportation with amendment (14-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2015-02-10 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-10 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-09 | House | Printed as engrossed 15103408D-E |
2015-02-09 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB2391E |
2015-02-09 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2015-02-09 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-05 | House | Reported from Transportation with amendment (22-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-05 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-30 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #4 |
2015-01-23 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2015-01-23 | House | Presented and ordered printed 15103408D |