VA HB2390 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0803)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Renewable energy power purchase agreements; pilot programs. Expands the pilot program for renewable energy power purchase agreements authorized under legislation enacted in 2013 by directing that a pilot program be conducted by Appalachian Power. Currently, a pilot program is authorized only within Dominion Power's service territory. The measure provides that within the certificated service territory of Appalachian Power, nonprofit, private institutions of higher education that are not being served under a specific renewable generation tariff provision are deemed to be customer-generators eligible to participate in the pilot program, without the requirement that they participate in the utility's net energy metering program. The aggregated capacity of all generation facilities that are subject to third party power purchase agreements in Appalachian Power's pilot program is capped at seven megawatts. The measure does not apply to Old Dominion Power. Appalachian Power's pilot program expires July 1, 2022.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Renewable energy power purchase agreements; expands pilot program, sunset provision.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 1-N 1-A) (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (24-Y 15-N) (Y: 24 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (25-Y 14-N) (Y: 25 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (70-Y 25-N 1-A) (Y: 70 N: 25 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (16-Y 3-N) (Y: 16 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (11-Y 1-N) (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-05 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0803)
2017-04-05HouseEnacted, Chapter 803 (effective 7/1/17)
2017-04-05SenateSigned by President as reenrolled
2017-04-05HouseSigned by Speaker as reenrolled
2017-04-05HouseReenrolled bill text (HB2390ER2)
2017-04-05HouseReenrolled
2017-04-05 Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted
2017-04-05SenateSenate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
2017-04-05HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 1-N 1-A)
2017-04-05HouseHouse concurred in Governor's recommendation (98-Y 1-N 1-A)
2017-04-05HousePlaced on Calendar
2017-03-24HouseGovernor's recommendation received by House
2017-02-21 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017
2017-02-21HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/21/17
2017-02-21HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2390ER)
2017-02-21SenateSigned by President
2017-02-21HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-02-21HouseEnrolled
2017-02-17SenatePassed Senate (24-Y 15-N)
2017-02-17SenateReconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2017-02-17SenatePassed Senate (25-Y 14-N)
2017-02-17SenatePassed by temporarily
2017-02-17SenateRead third time
2017-02-16SenatePassed by for the day
2017-02-16SenateRead third time
2017-02-15SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2017-02-13SenateReported from Commerce and Labor (13-Y 1-N)
2017-02-08SenateReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2017-02-08SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2017-02-07HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (70-Y 25-N 1-A)
2017-02-07HouseRead third time and passed House (70-Y 25-N 1-A)
2017-02-06HousePrinted as engrossed 17103912D-E
2017-02-06HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB2390E
2017-02-06HouseCommittee amendments agreed to
2017-02-06HouseRead second time
2017-02-04HouseRead first time
2017-02-02HouseReported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (16-Y 3-N)
2017-01-31HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (11-Y 1-N)
2017-01-24HouseAssigned C & L sub: Special Subcommittee on Energy
2017-01-18HouseReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2017-01-18HousePresented and ordered printed 17103912D

Subjects


Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+HB2390
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB2390+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB2390E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB2390ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB2390ER2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+CHAP0803+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+H1403V0009+HB2390
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+H14V0086+HB2390
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+HV2087+HB2390
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+S02V0116+HB2390
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0554HB2390+HB2390
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0674HB2390+HB2390
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0676HB2390+HB2390
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0677HB2390+HB2390
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+HV2900+HB2390
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV1186HB2390+HB2390

Bill Comments

feedback