VA HB2388 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-07 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-07 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Public elementary and secondary schools; programs of instruction; mental health education; curriculum guidelines; instruction required. Requires each public elementary, middle, and high school to provide at each grade level, in addition to health instruction, an additional age-appropriate course of instruction on mental health. The bill directs the Board of Education to develop mental health curriculum guidelines for an age-appropriate, sequential mental health curriculum for each grade level and requires such curriculum guidelines to include instruction on (i) understanding general themes of social and emotional learning, including self-awareness, self-management, responsible decision making, relationship skills, and social awareness; (ii) recognizing symptoms of common mental health challenges; (iii) promoting mental health wellness and healthy strategies for coping with stress and negative feelings, including conflict resolution skills; (iv) seeking assistance for mental health concerns and challenges; (v) promoting awareness of the prevalence of mental health challenges and the importance of overcoming common mental health stigmas; (vi) understanding the importance of mental health to a student's physical, academic, and overall well-being; and (vii) understanding age-appropriate instruction at such grade levels as the Board deems appropriate on the connection between mental health and substance use disorders. The bill permits the Board to consult with the Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services and other mental health experts in developing such curriculum guidelines and requires the Board to submit such guidelines to the State Board of Health for approval. The bill requires the Board to review and update by the beginning of the 2024–2025 school year the health Standards of Learning for each grade level to include such instruction on the mental health curriculum guidelines. Public elementary and secondary schools; programs of instruction; mental health education; curriculum guidelines; instruction required. Requires each public elementary, middle, and high school to provide at each grade level, in addition to health instruction, an additional age-appropriate course of instruction on mental health. The bill directs the Board of Education to develop mental health curriculum guidelines for an age-appropriate, sequential mental health curriculum for each grade level and requires such curriculum guidelines to include instruction on (i) understanding general themes of social and emotional learning, including self-awareness, self-management, responsible decision making, relationship skills, and social awareness; (ii) recognizing symptoms of common mental health challenges; (iii) promoting mental health wellness and healthy strategies for coping with stress and negative feelings, including conflict resolution skills; (iv) seeking assistance for mental health concerns and challenges; (v) promoting awareness of the prevalence of mental health challenges and the importance of overcoming common mental health stigmas; (vi) understanding the importance of mental health to a student's physical, academic, and overall well-being; and (vii) understanding age-appropriate instruction at such grade levels as the Board deems appropriate on the connection between mental health and substance use disorders. The bill permits the Board to consult with the Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services and other mental health experts in developing such curriculum guidelines and requires the Board to submit such guidelines to the State Board of Health for approval. The bill requires the Board to review and update by the beginning of the 2024–2025 school year the health Standards of Learning for each grade level to include such instruction on the mental health curriculum guidelines.
Title
Public elementary and secondary schools; programs of instruction on mental health education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-07 | House | Left in Education |
2023-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) |
2023-01-26 | House | Assigned Education sub: Early Childhood/Innovation |
2023-01-16 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2023-01-16 | House | Presented and ordered printed 23104653D |
Subjects
Behavioral Health and Developmental Services
Education
Elementary Schools
Public Schools
Secondary Schools
Education
Elementary Schools
Public Schools
Secondary Schools