VA HB2384 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Drinking water; lead levels. Directs the State Board of Health to adopt regulations establishing the action level for lead in drinking water as 10 parts per billion beginning January 1, 2018, and as five parts per billion beginning January 1, 2022. The bill authorizes the Board to establish lower action levels for lead in drinking water.
Title
Drinking water; lead levels.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-07 | House | Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2017-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2017-01-23 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2017-01-17 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2017-01-17 | House | Presented and ordered printed 17103773D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+HB2384 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB2384+hil |