VA HB2382 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-07 - Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Virginia Consumer Protection Act; personal reproductive or sexual health information. Adds obtaining, disclosing, selling, or disseminating certain enumerated personal reproductive or sexual health information without the consent of the consumer as a prohibited practice under the Virginia Consumer Protection Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Virginia Consumer Protection Act; personal reproductive or sexual health information.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (3-Y 2-N) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-07HouseLeft in Health, Welfare and Institutions
2023-02-02HouseSubcommittee recommends laying on the table (3-Y 2-N)
2023-01-31HouseAssigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #3
2023-01-16HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2023-01-16HousePresented and ordered printed 23104473D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
591200(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback