VA HB2380 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Conflict of Interest and Ethics Advisory Council; investigative authority. Authorizes the Virginia Conflict of Interest and Ethics Advisory Council to investigate alleged violations of the State and Local Government Conflict of Interests Act and the General Assembly Conflicts of Interests Act (the Acts). The Council may initiate an investigation upon its own motion or in response to a citizen complaint. Before beginning an investigation in response to a citizen complaint, the Council is required to conduct a preliminary inquiry to determine whether the facts stated in the complaint, when taken as true, are sufficient to show that a violation of the Acts warrants an investigation. The bill details (i) the authority of the Council to issue subpoenas and the rights of the subject of an investigation; (ii) prerequisites for a finding of a violation of the Acts, including the conduct of a public hearing; and (iii) the requirements for referral of a violation of the Acts to appropriate authorities.
Title
Virginia Conflict of Interest and Ethics Advisory Council; investigative authority.
Sponsors
Del. Marcus Simon [D] | Sen. Jennifer Boysko [D] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] | Del. Kenneth Plum [D] |
Del. Roslyn Tyler [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-07 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2017-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2017-01-18 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Ethics |
2017-01-17 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2017-01-17 | House | Presented and ordered printed 17103797D |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+HB2380 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB2380+hil |