VA HB238 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0288)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0288)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Absentee voting; deadline for returning absentee ballot. Provides that any absentee ballot that is returned to the general registrar after the closing of the polls on election day but before noon on the third day after the election and postmarked on or before the date of the election shall be counted if the voter is found entitled to vote.
Title
Absentee voting; deadline for returning absentee ballot.
Sponsors
Del. Mark Sickles [D] | Del. Kathy Tran [D] | Del. Dan Helmer [D] | Del. Mark Levine [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (13-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (13-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0288) | |
2020-03-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 288 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-05 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 12, 2020 | |
2020-03-05 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 5, 2020 |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-02-27 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-02-26 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB238ER) |
2020-02-26 | House | Enrolled |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Passed Senate (35-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections (13-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-01-30 | House | VOTE: Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-30 | House | Read third time and passed House (100-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-29 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-01-28 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-24 | House | Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-13 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Elections |
2019-12-30 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2019-12-30 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101272D |
Same As/Similar To
SB455 (Same As) 2020-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0933)