VA HB2378 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
High school graduation requirements; substitution of computer coding credit for foreign language credit. Requires the Board, in establishing high school graduation requirements, to provide for the substitution of computer coding course credit for any foreign language course credit required to graduate, except in cases in which such foreign language course credit is required to earn an advanced diploma offered by a nationally recognized provider of college-level courses.
Title
High school graduation requirements; substitution of computer coding for foreign language credit.
Sponsors
Del. Glenn Davis [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-07 | House | Left in Education |
2017-01-26 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2017-01-20 | House | Assigned Education sub: Education Innovation |
2017-01-17 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2017-01-17 | House | Presented and ordered printed 17104066D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+HB2378 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB2378+hil |