VA HB2377 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Counties, Cities and Towns
Pending: House Counties, Cities and Towns Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Memorials for war veterans. Provides that a locality may remove or provide for the upkeep, maintenance, or contextualization of any monument or memorial for war veterans located in its public space, regardless of when erected. Current law makes it unlawful to disturb or interfere with such monuments or memorials or to prevent citizens from taking proper measures and exercising proper means for the protection, preservation, and care of such monuments or memorials.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

War veterans; removal or upkeep of monument or memorial.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (2-Y 6-N) (Y: 2 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-05HouseLeft in Counties, Cities and Towns
2019-01-30HouseSubcommittee failed to recommend reporting (2-Y 6-N)
2019-01-14HouseAssigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #1
2019-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
2019-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102624D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1521812(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback