VA HB2376 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-07 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Virginia Creative Economy Grant Fund and Program. Establishes the Virginia Creative Economy Grant Fund and the Virginia Creative Economy Grant Fund, to be administered by the Virginia Economic Development Partnership Authority, for the purpose of awarding grants to independent content creators and creative entrepreneurs for the purpose of developing and expanding the creative economy in Virginia. The bill provides for the award of grants of no more than $20,000 to any recipient.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Virginia Creative Economy Grant Fund and Program; established.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-07HouseLeft in General Laws
2023-01-26HouseSubcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 2-N)
2023-01-18HouseAssigned GL sub: Subcommittee #1
2023-01-16HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2023-01-16HousePresented and ordered printed 23103899D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
222240.7(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback