VA HB2376 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-08 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-08 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Property Owners' Association Act; fees for disclosure packets by associations not professionally managed. Provides that an association that is not professionally managed may act as a professionally managed association only upon complying with specific conditions set out in the bill. The bill also states that an association that is not professionally managed that satisfies each of these conditions and that performs the responsibilities of a professionally managed association shall have the liabilities and receive the compensation of a professionally managed association.
Title
Property Owners' Association Act; fees for disclosure packets by associations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-08 | House | Left in General Laws |
2017-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2017-01-23 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2017-01-16 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2017-01-16 | House | Presented and ordered printed 17103550D |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+HB2376 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB2376+hil |