VA HB2373 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Marijuana; legalization of simple marijuana possession; Marijuana; legalization of simple marijuana possession; penalty. Eliminates criminal penalties for possession of marijuana for persons who are 21 years of age or older. The bill also decriminalizes marijuana possession for persons under 21 years of age and provides a civil penalty of no more than $100 for possession of less than (i) two and one-half ounces of marijuana or (ii) 12 marijuana plants and a civil penalty of no more than $500 for possession of more than (i) two and one-half ounces of marijuana or (ii) 12 marijuana plants. Under current law, a first offense is punishable by a maximum fine of $500 and a maximum jail sentence of 30 days, and subsequent offenses are a Class 1 misdemeanor. The bill also modifies several other criminal penalties related to marijuana. The bill establishes a regulatory scheme for the regulation of marijuana cultivation facilities, marijuana manufacturing facilities, marijuana secure transporters, marijuana testing facilities, retail marijuana stores, and marijuana microbusinesses by the Board of Agriculture and Consumer Services. The bill imposes an additional tax of 10 percent on retail marijuana and retail marijuana products sold by retail marijuana stores and microbusinesses and directs the first $20 million of such revenues to the Veterans Treatment Fund, established in the bill. The remaining tax receipts will be distributed to the localities in which the businesses operate, toward the state's share of Standards of Quality basic aid

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Marijuana; legalization of simple marijuana possession, penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-05HouseLeft in Courts of Justice
2019-01-16HouseSubcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (6-Y 2-N)
2019-01-15HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
2019-01-08HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103975D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
161260(n/a)See Bill Text
161273(n/a)See Bill Text
161278.8:01(n/a)See Bill Text
161278.9(n/a)See Bill Text
16169.48:1(n/a)See Bill Text
182247(n/a)See Bill Text
182248(n/a)See Bill Text
182248.01(n/a)See Bill Text
182248.1(n/a)See Bill Text
182250.1(n/a)See Bill Text
182251(n/a)See Bill Text
182251.03(n/a)See Bill Text
182251.1(n/a)See Bill Text
182252(n/a)See Bill Text
182254(n/a)See Bill Text
182255(n/a)See Bill Text
182255.1(n/a)See Bill Text
182255.2(n/a)See Bill Text
182258(n/a)See Bill Text
182258.02(n/a)See Bill Text
182258.1(n/a)See Bill Text
182259.1(n/a)See Bill Text
182265.1(n/a)See Bill Text
182265.2(n/a)See Bill Text
182265.3(n/a)See Bill Text
182287.2(n/a)See Bill Text
182308.09(n/a)See Bill Text
182308.1:5(n/a)See Bill Text
182308.4(n/a)See Bill Text
18246.1(n/a)See Bill Text
182460(n/a)See Bill Text
182474.1(n/a)See Bill Text
19211.2(n/a)See Bill Text
192120(n/a)See Bill Text
192188.1(n/a)See Bill Text
192303.01(n/a)See Bill Text
192386.22(n/a)See Bill Text
192386.25(n/a)See Bill Text
192389(n/a)See Bill Text
192392.02(n/a)See Bill Text
19266(n/a)See Bill Text
19283.1(n/a)See Bill Text
223705.3(n/a)See Bill Text
223711(n/a)See Bill Text
221277.08(n/a)See Bill Text
242233(n/a)See Bill Text
324113(n/a)See Bill Text
324121(n/a)See Bill Text
324199.6(n/a)See Bill Text
372416(n/a)See Bill Text
41225(n/a)See Bill Text
462390.1(n/a)See Bill Text
531231.2(n/a)See Bill Text
5413408.3(n/a)See Bill Text
5413442.6(n/a)See Bill Text
5413442.8(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback