VA HB2370 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Possession and consumption of marijuana; penalty. Decriminalizes simple marijuana possession and provides a civil penalty of no more than $250. Current law imposes a maximum fine of $500 and a maximum 30-day jail sentence for a first offense, and subsequent offenses are a Class 1 misdemeanor. But the bill provides that any person who knowingly or intentionally smokes, consumes, or otherwise ingests marijuana in a public place or while driving or operating a motor vehicle, engine, train, watercraft, or motorboat is guilty of a misdemeanor and shall be confined in jail not more than 30 days and fined not more than $500, either or both, and subsequent convictions are punished as a Class 1 misdemeanor. The bill also provides that the suspended sentence/substance abuse screening provisions and driver's license suspension provisions apply only to criminal violations or to civil violations by a juvenile. A civil violation will be treated as a conviction for prohibitions on the purchase or transport of a handgun and disqualification for a concealed handgun permit.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Marijuana; possession and consumption, penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-05HouseLeft in Courts of Justice
2019-01-16HouseSubcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 3-N)
2019-01-15HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
2019-01-08HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19104173D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
161228(n/a)See Bill Text
161260(n/a)See Bill Text
161273(n/a)See Bill Text
182250.1(n/a)See Bill Text
182250.2(n/a)See Bill Text
182251(n/a)See Bill Text
182251.02(n/a)See Bill Text
182251.03(n/a)See Bill Text
182252(n/a)See Bill Text
182254(n/a)See Bill Text
182259.1(n/a)See Bill Text
182308.09(n/a)See Bill Text
182308.1:5(n/a)See Bill Text
192188.1(n/a)See Bill Text
462390.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback