VA HB237 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0287)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0287)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Local electoral boards; terms to begin January 1. Provides for terms of local electoral board members to begin on January 1. If the results of an election have not been certified by the board or a recount of an election has not concluded, the term will expire at midnight on the day the results are certified or the recount is concluded, instead of December 31. Under current law, terms begin March 1.
Title
Electoral boards, local; terms to begin January 1.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (13-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (98-Y 1-N) (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendment (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (13-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (98-Y 1-N) (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendment (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0287) | |
2020-03-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 287 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-05 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 12, 2020 | |
2020-03-05 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 5, 2020 |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-02-27 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-02-26 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB237ER) |
2020-02-26 | House | Enrolled |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Passed Senate (35-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections (13-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-06 | House | VOTE: Passage (98-Y 1-N) |
2020-02-06 | House | Read third time and passed House (98-Y 1-N) |
2020-02-05 | House | Printed as engrossed 20101266D-E |
2020-02-05 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB237E |
2020-02-05 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2020-02-05 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-04 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-31 | House | Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendment (20-Y 1-N) |
2020-01-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-13 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Gubernatorial Appointments |
2019-12-30 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2019-12-30 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101266D |