VA HB2369 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-07 - Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Medical marijuana program; dispensaries. Removes the requirement that a cannabis dispensing facility be owned, at least in part, by a pharmaceutical processor and increases from five to 12 the number of cannabis dispensing facility permits the Board of Pharmacy may issue per year in each health service area.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Medical marijuana program; dispensaries.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-07HouseLeft in Health, Welfare and Institutions
2023-02-02HouseSubcommittee recommends striking from docket (6-Y 0-N)
2023-01-25HouseAssigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #3
2023-01-13HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2023-01-13HousePresented and ordered printed 23104246D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5413442.5(n/a)See Bill Text
5413442.6(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback