VA HB2366 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-07 - Left in Commerce and Energy
Pending: House Commerce and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Health insurance; coverage for the diagnosis of and treatment for infertility and standard fertility preservation procedures. Requires health insurance policies, subscription contracts, and health care plans to provide coverage for the diagnosis and treatment of infertility and for standard fertility preservation procedures, defined in the bill. Such coverage includes coverage for in vitro fertilization, provided that procedures are performed at medical facilities or clinics that conform to guidelines published by the American College of Obstetrics and Gynecology or the American Fertility Society for in vitro fertilization procedures.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health insurance; coverage for diagnosis of and treatment for infertility.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 3-N) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-07HouseLeft in Commerce and Energy
2023-01-24HouseSubcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 3-N)
2023-01-19HouseAssigned sub: Subcommittee #4
2023-01-13HouseReferred to Committee on Commerce and Energy
2023-01-13HousePresented and ordered printed 23104439D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3823418.21(n/a)See Bill Text
3824319(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback