VA HB2366 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-10 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-10 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Bail bondsmen; licensure of nonresidents; security requirements. Requires, in order for a nonresident transfer or applicant to be licensed as a bail bondsman, that such transfer or applicant furnish bond executed by the nonresident transfer or applicant and by a licensed corporate surety payable to the Department of Criminal Justice Services (the Department) in the amount of at least $50,000. In lieu of furnishing a bond, the bill allows the transfer or applicant to deposit cash or other collateral with the Department in the amount of at least $50,000. The bill requires that the bond furnished or cash or other collateral deposited be forfeited to the Department in the event that the transfer or applicant fails to pay any forfeited bail bond or recognizance in the amount for which the nonresident transfer or applicant was liable on the bail bond or recognizance.
Title
Bail bondsmen; licensure of nonresidents, security requirements.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-10 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2015-02-04 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2015-01-26 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law |
2015-01-23 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2015-01-23 | House | Presented and ordered printed 15103730D |
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+sum+HB2366 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+HB2366+hil |