VA HB2362 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0366)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0366)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Burial fees for military spouses. Provides that, from such funds as may be appropriated or otherwise received for such purpose, the Commonwealth shall pay any burial fee for (i) a member of the National Guard and Reserve or (ii) a deceased spouse of a member or veteran of the United States Armed Forces or of the National Guard and Reserve, regardless of whether such spouse's death precedes or succeeds the death of the member or veteran.
Title
Military spouses; burial fees.
Sponsors
Del. Bill Wiley [R] | Del. Kelly Convirs-Fowler [D] | Del. Elizabeth Guzman [D] | Sen. Emily Brewer [R] |
Del. Mike Cherry [R] | Del. Phillip Scott [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (97-Y 1-N) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (15-Y 1-N) (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (98-Y 1-N) (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (15-Y 1-N) (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (98-Y 1-N) (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0366) | |
2023-03-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 366 (effective 7/1/23) | |
2023-03-02 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023 | |
2023-03-02 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 2, 2023 |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-02-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-02-20 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2362ER) |
2023-02-20 | House | Enrolled |
2023-02-14 | House | VOTE: Adoption (97-Y 1-N) |
2023-02-14 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 23106400D-S1 (97-Y 1-N) |
2023-02-14 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (38-Y 1-N) |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB2362S1 |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 23106400D-S1 |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Read third time |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 23106400D-S1 |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (15-Y 1-N) |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2023-01-31 | House | VOTE: Passage (98-Y 1-N) |
2023-01-31 | House | Read third time and passed House (98-Y 1-N) |
2023-01-30 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2362H1 |
2023-01-30 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 23105237D-H1 |
2023-01-30 | House | Read second time |
2023-01-27 | House | Read first time |
2023-01-25 | House | Committee substitute printed 23105237D-H1 |
2023-01-25 | House | Reported from Appropriations with substitute (20-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-18 | House | Assigned App. sub: Transportation & Public Safety |
2023-01-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2023-01-13 | House | Presented and ordered printed 23103476D |
Same As/Similar To
SB924 (Same As) 2023-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0367)
SB924 (Same As) 2023-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0367)
SB924 (Same As) 2023-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0367)