VA HB2361 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-19 - Left in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
Pending: Senate Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-19 - Left in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
Pending: Senate Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Stormwater management; land-disturbing activities; prior technical criteria. Provides that the statewide technical criteria for stormwater management that were adopted by the State Water Control Board during 2011 and became effective July 1, 2014, shall be applicable to those land-disturbing activities that are subject to a stormwater management permit that was initially issued prior to July 1, 2014, where notice of transfer of such permit to another party is provided to the Department of Environmental Quality after December 31, 2020, but no land-disturbing activities have commenced before such provision of notice. The bill creates exceptions for projects involving certain governmental bonding or public debt financing and for land-disturbing activities that are served by existing stormwater management facilities.
Title
Stormwater management; land-disturbing activities, current regulations.
Sponsors
Del. Chris Jones [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-19 | Senate | Left in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-02-04 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-04 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-04 | House | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House |
2019-02-04 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-04 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-01 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2361H1 |
2019-02-01 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 19106039D-H1 |
2019-02-01 | House | Read second time |
2019-01-31 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-30 | House | Committee substitute printed 19106039D-H1 |
2019-01-30 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (21-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (9-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-16 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2019-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19104018D |