VA HB2354 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0347)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Revenue Stabilization Fund and Revenue Reserve Fund; maximum amounts. Provides that the combined funds in the Revenue Stabilization Fund and Revenue Reserve Fund shall not exceed 15 percent of average income and sales tax revenues for the past three years. Under current law, the amount in the Revenue Stabilization Fund shall not exceed 15 percent of average income and sales tax revenues for the past three years, and the amount in the Revenue Reserve Fund shall not exceed two percent of general fund revenues for the prior year.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revenue Stabilization Fund and Revenue Reserve Fund; maximum amounts.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-12 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0347)
2019-03-12 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 347 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-02-21 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-21HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 21, 2019
2019-02-20SenateSigned by President
2019-02-19HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-19HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2354ER)
2019-02-19HouseEnrolled
2019-02-14SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-14SenateRead third time
2019-02-13SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2019-02-12SenateReported from Finance (15-Y 0-N)
2019-01-30SenateReferred to Committee on Finance
2019-01-30SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-01-29HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-01-29HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-01-28HouseRead second time and engrossed
2019-01-25HouseRead first time
2019-01-23HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2019-01-23HouseReported from Appropriations (20-Y 0-N)
2019-01-14HouseAssigned App. sub: General Government & Capital Outlay
2019-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2019-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101707D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
221829(n/a)See Bill Text
221831.3(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback