VA HB2351 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-20 - Requires 27 affirmative votes for passage
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-20 - Requires 27 affirmative votes for passage
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Unoccupied property; grass cutting; Buchanan County. Authorizes Buchanan County, by ordinance, to require owners of unoccupied or abandoned property to cut grass on the property or to cut grass on the property and charge the owner for the service.
Title
Grass; Buchanan County authorized to require owners to cut.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Defeated by Senate (21-Y 18-N) (Y: 21 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of defeated action agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Defeated by Senate (25-Y 13-N) (Y: 25 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (10-Y 3-N) (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (71-Y 24-N) (Y: 71 N: 24 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (18-Y 3-N) (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of defeated action agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Defeated by Senate (25-Y 13-N) (Y: 25 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (10-Y 3-N) (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (71-Y 24-N) (Y: 71 N: 24 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (18-Y 3-N) (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-20 | Senate | Requires 27 affirmative votes for passage |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Defeated by Senate (21-Y 18-N) |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Reconsideration of defeated action agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Requires 27 affirmative votes for passage |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Defeated by Senate (25-Y 13-N) |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Reported from Local Government (10-Y 3-N) |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2017-02-03 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (71-Y 24-N) |
2017-02-03 | House | Read third time and passed House (71-Y 24-N) |
2017-02-02 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2017-02-01 | House | Passed by for the day |
2017-01-31 | House | Passed by for the day |
2017-01-30 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-27 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (18-Y 3-N) |
2017-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-19 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2017-01-16 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2017-01-16 | House | Presented and ordered printed 17103816D |