VA HB2350 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0561)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0561)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Education; student data security. Directs the Department of Education (the Department), in collaboration with the Virginia Information Technologies Agency, to develop a model data security plan that may be used by school divisions to implement policies and procedures related to the protection of student data and data systems. The Department would also be required to designate a chief data security officer to assist local school divisions with the development or implementation of data security plans. The bill also authorizes the Department to convene a working group to assist with the initial development of the model plan.
Title
Student data security; Department of Education to develop a model data security plan.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0561) | |
2015-03-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 561 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-03-04 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-03-04 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/4/15 |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-02-27 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-27 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2350ER) |
2015-02-27 | House | Enrolled |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Read third time |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2015-02-09 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-09 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-06 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2015-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-04 | House | Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-02 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-26 | House | Assigned Education sub: Elementary and Secondary Education |
2015-01-23 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2015-01-23 | House | Presented and ordered printed 15103158D |