VA HB2347 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-08 - Passed by indefinitely in General Laws and Technology with letter (11-Y 4-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Department of Planning and Budget; Regulatory Budget Program; report. Directs the Department of Planning and Budget, under the direction of the Secretary of Finance, to establish a continuous Regulatory Budget Program with the goal of setting a two-year target for each executive branch agency subject to the Administrative Process Act to (i) reduce regulations and regulatory requirements, (ii) maintain the current number of regulations and regulatory requirements, or (iii) allow regulations and regulatory requirements to increase by a specific amount over a two-year period. The bill requires the Secretary of Finance to report to the Speaker of the House of Delegates and the Chairman of the Senate Committee on Rules on the status of the Program no later than October 1 of each odd-numbered year. Finally, the bill provides that the Department, in consultation with the Office of the Attorney General, shall, by March 1, 2024, issue guidance for agencies regarding the Program and how an agency can comply with the requirements of the Program. The bill has an expiration date of January 1, 2027.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regulatory Budget Program; DPB to establish, report.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in General Laws and Technology with letter (11-Y 4-N) (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (53-Y 47-N) (Y: 53 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 3-N) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-08SenatePassed by indefinitely in General Laws and Technology with letter (11-Y 4-N)
2023-01-31SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2023-01-31SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2023-01-30HouseVOTE: Passage (53-Y 47-N)
2023-01-30HouseRead third time and passed House (53-Y 47-N)
2023-01-27HouseRead second time and engrossed
2023-01-26HouseRead first time
2023-01-24HouseReported from General Laws (12-Y 10-N)
2023-01-19HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 3-N)
2023-01-18HouseAssigned GL sub: Subcommittee #1
2023-01-12HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2023-01-12HousePresented and ordered printed 23101759D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
221501.2(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback