VA HB2343 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0783)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Reports to Central Criminal Record Exchange; duties and authority of the Central Criminal Records Exchange; unapplied criminal history record information. Requires the Central Criminal Records Exchange (Exchange) to review offenses containing unapplied criminal history record information, defined in the bill, and make reasonable efforts to ensure that such information is applied to criminal history records. The bill requires the Exchange to submit periodic reports to the Office of the Executive Secretary of the Supreme Court of Virginia, the clerk of each circuit court and district court, attorneys for the Commonwealth, and law-enforcement agencies containing (i) a list of offenses with unapplied criminal history record information and (ii) for each offense, if known, the name and any other identifying information of the defendant, any identifying court case information, the date of submission to the Exchange, and the reason the offense could not be applied to the criminal history record. The bill also requires the Exchange to submit an annual report to the Governor and General Assembly on the status of unapplied criminal history record information and any updates to fingerprinting policies and procedures.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Central Criminal Records Exchange; reports, duties and authority.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-22 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0783)
2019-03-22 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 783 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-02-19 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-19HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 19, 2019
2019-02-15SenateSigned by President
2019-02-15HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-15HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2343ER)
2019-02-15HouseEnrolled
2019-02-13HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13HouseSenate substitute agreed to by House 19106497D-S1 (96-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-11SenatePassed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-11SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB2343S1
2019-02-11SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 19106497D-S1
2019-02-11SenateReading of substitute waived
2019-02-11SenateRead third time
2019-02-08SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-06SenateCommittee substitute printed 19106497D-S1
2019-02-06SenateReported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
2019-02-01SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-02-01SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-01-31HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-01-31HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-01-30HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB2343H1
2019-01-30HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19105587D-H1
2019-01-30HouseRead second time
2019-01-29HouseRead first time
2019-01-25HouseCommittee substitute printed 19105587D-H1
2019-01-25HouseReported from Courts of Justice with substitute (16-Y 0-N)
2019-01-23HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
2019-01-17HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
2019-01-08HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19104175D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
182251(n/a)See Bill Text
18257.3(n/a)See Bill Text
192232(n/a)See Bill Text
192303(n/a)See Bill Text
192303.02(n/a)See Bill Text
192303.2(n/a)See Bill Text
192305.1(n/a)See Bill Text
192388(n/a)See Bill Text
192390(n/a)See Bill Text
192390.03(n/a)See Bill Text
192392(n/a)See Bill Text
19274(n/a)See Bill Text
531145(n/a)See Bill Text
53123(n/a)See Bill Text
91101(n/a)See Bill Text
91176.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB2343
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2343+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2343H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2343S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2343ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0783+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0801V0088+HB2343
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H08V0080+HB2343
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2083+HB2343
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S03V0214+HB2343
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0488HB2343+HB2343
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0492HB2343+HB2343
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2794+HB2343

Bill Comments

feedback