VA HB2343 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-05 - (67 affirmative votes required to override)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Voter registration list maintenance; voters identified as having duplicate registrations. Requires the Department of Elections to provide to the general registrars a list of registered voters who have been found through list comparisons and data-matching exchanges with other states to be registered in another state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Voter registration list maintenance; voters identified as having duplicate registrations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-05 - House - House: VOTE: OVERRIDE GOVERNOR'S VETO (65-Y 35-N) (Y: 65 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (23-Y 15-N) (Y: 23 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (9-Y 5-N) (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (68-Y 30-N) (Y: 68 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (15-Y 7-N) (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-05House(67 affirmative votes required to override)
2017-04-05HouseVOTE: OVERRIDE GOVERNOR'S VETO (65-Y 35-N)
2017-04-05HouseHouse sustained Governor's veto (65-Y 35-N)
2017-04-05HousePlaced on Calendar
2017-03-13 Governor: Vetoed by Governor
2017-02-21 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017
2017-02-21HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/21/17
2017-02-21HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2343ER)
2017-02-21SenateSigned by President
2017-02-21HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-02-21HouseEnrolled
2017-02-17SenatePassed Senate (23-Y 15-N)
2017-02-17SenateRead third time
2017-02-16SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2017-02-14SenateReported from Privileges and Elections (9-Y 5-N)
2017-02-02SenateReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2017-02-02SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2017-02-01HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (68-Y 30-N)
2017-02-01HouseRead third time and passed House (68-Y 30-N)
2017-01-31HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB2343H1
2017-01-31HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 17104858D-H1
2017-01-31HouseRead second time
2017-01-30HouseRead first time
2017-01-27HouseCommittee substitute printed 17104858D-H1
2017-01-27HouseReported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (15-Y 7-N)
2017-01-26HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 2-N)
2017-01-18HouseAssigned P & E sub: Campaigns
2017-01-13HouseReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2017-01-13HousePresented and ordered printed 17101321D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
242114(n/a)See Bill Text
242404.4(n/a)See Bill Text
242427.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+HB2343
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB2343+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB2343H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB2343ER+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+H1802V0010+HB2343
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+H18V0019+HB2343
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+HV1795+HB2343
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+S08V0123+HB2343
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0627HB2343+HB2343
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0667HB2343+HB2343
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+HV2866+HB2343

Bill Comments

feedback