VA HB2343 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-10 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Feeding of game, game animals, and fur-bearing animals. Directs the Board of Game and Inland Fisheries to allow the feeding of certain wildlife on privately owned land regardless of whether it is an open or closed season for hunting or trapping of wildlife.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Game, game animals, and fur-bearing animals; BGIF to allow feeding of certain wildlife.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-02-10HouseLeft in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
2015-01-28HouseSubcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely by voice vote
2015-01-26HouseAssigned ACNRsub: Natural Resources
2015-01-23HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
2015-01-23HousePresented and ordered printed 15103790D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
291501(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback