VA HB2343 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-08 - House: Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety
Pending: House Militia, Police and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Carrying a handgun while under the influence of alcohol or drugs; penalty. Creates a Class 1 misdemeanor for any person carrying a handgun in a public place while under the influence of alcohol or drugs and prohibits a person from obtaining a concealed handgun permit for five years following such a conviction. The prohibition applies regardless of whether the person is carrying the handgun openly or concealed with a concealed handgun permit. Current law makes it a Class 1 misdemeanor to carry a concealed handgun in a public place while under the influence of alcohol or drugs, but does not speak to openly carrying a handgun while under the influence.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Handgun; Class 1 misdemeanor for carrying while under influence of alcohol or drugs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-02-08 House: Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety
2011-02-03 House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (5-Y 0-N)
2011-01-31 House: Assigned MPPS sub: #1
2011-01-19 House: Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety
2011-01-19 House: Referred from Courts of Justice by voice vote
2011-01-19 House: Assigned Courts sub: #1 Criminal
2011-01-12 House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2011-01-12 House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11102188D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
182287.5(n/a)See Bill Text
182308(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback