VA HB2342 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0236)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0236)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Background checks; services for children and developmental services; adult substance abuse and mental health services. Separates background check requirements for direct care positions with service providers and community services boards. The bill separates provisions regarding background checks of employees in direct care positions providing adult substance abuse and mental health services from those of background checks of employees in direct care positions providing services for children and developmental services. Background checks; services for children and developmental services; adult substance abuse and mental health services. Separates background check requirements for direct care positions with service providers and community services boards. The bill separates provisions regarding background checks of employees in direct care positions providing adult substance abuse and mental health services from those of background checks of employees in direct care positions providing services for children and developmental services.
Title
Background checks; employees of children and developmental services, adult substance abuse services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-22 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0236) | |
2023-03-22 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 236 (effective 7/1/23) | |
2023-03-02 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023 | |
2023-03-02 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 2, 2023 |
2023-02-25 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-02-23 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-02-23 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2342ER) |
2023-02-23 | House | Enrolled |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Read third time |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2023-02-06 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-06 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-03 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2023-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2023-01-31 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (21-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-26 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-19 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2023-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2023-01-12 | House | Presented and ordered printed 23101521D |
2023-01-12 | House | Unanimous consent to introduce |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | 2 | 389 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
37 | 2 | 203.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
37 | 2 | 416 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
37 | 2 | 416.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
37 | 2 | 506 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
37 | 2 | 506.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
37 | 2 | 607 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |