VA HB2342 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0245)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0245)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Conditional rezoning proffers. Makes extensive changes to conditional zoning provisions first enacted in 2016. Specific amendments include the addition of provisions stating that no local governing body shall require any unreasonable proffer, as described in current law. Under current law, no locality may request or accept any unreasonable proffer. Other changes (i) allow an applicant to submit any onsite or offsite proffer that the applicant deems reasonable and appropriate, as conclusively evidenced by the signed proffers, and (ii) state that nothing in the bill shall be deemed or interpreted to prohibit communications between an applicant or owner and the locality or to prohibit presentation, analysis, or discussion of the potential impacts of new residential development or other new residential use on the locality's public facilities. The provisions of the bill are effective as to any application for a rezoning filed on or after July 1, 2019, or for a proffer condition amendment amending a rezoning that was filed on or after July 1, 2019, or to certain other pending applications. The bill also provides that an applicant with a pending rezoning application for a rezoning or proffer condition amendment that was filed prior to July 1, 2016, may continue to proceed under the law as it existed prior to that date, and an applicant with a pending rezoning application filed on or after July 1, 2016, but before July 1, 2019, or proffer condition amendment application amending a rezoning for which the application was filed on or after July 1, 2016, but before July 1, 2019, may continue to proceed under the law as it existed during that period. This bill is identical to SB 1373.
Title
Conditional rezoning proffers; extensive changes to conditional zoning provisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (28-Y 10-N 1-A) (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (11-Y 1-N) (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (90-Y 7-N) (Y: 90 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (18-Y 2-N) (Y: 18 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (11-Y 1-N) (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (90-Y 7-N) (Y: 90 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (18-Y 2-N) (Y: 18 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-05 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0245) | |
2019-03-05 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 245 (effective - see bill) | |
2019-02-27 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-02-27 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 27, 2019 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-20 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2342ER) |
2019-02-20 | House | Enrolled |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Passed Senate (28-Y 10-N 1-A) |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Reported from Local Government (11-Y 1-N) |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-01-24 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (90-Y 7-N) |
2019-01-24 | House | Read third time and passed House (90-Y 7-N) |
2019-01-23 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2342H1 |
2019-01-23 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 19104992D-H1 |
2019-01-23 | House | Read second time |
2019-01-22 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-18 | House | Committee substitute printed 19104992D-H1 |
2019-01-18 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (18-Y 2-N) |
2019-01-16 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 1-N) |
2019-01-14 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2019-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19104303D |