VA HB234 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0794)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0794)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Division of Offshore Wind; established. Establishes the Division of Offshore Wind in the Department of Mines, Minerals and Energy and gives it the following powers and duties: (i) to identify specific measures that will facilitate the establishment of the Hampton Roads region as a wind industry hub for offshore wind generation projects in state and federal waters off the United States coast; (ii) to coordinate state agencies' activities related to offshore wind; (iii) to develop and implement a stakeholder engagement strategy that identifies key groups, sets forth outreach objectives, and outlines a timeline for outreach and engagement; (iv) to identify regulatory and other barriers to the deployment of offshore wind and attraction of offshore wind supply chain businesses; and (v) to provide staff support for the Virginia Offshore Wind Development Authority and facilitate fulfillment of the Authority's purpose and duties.
Title
Offshore Wind, Division of; established, report.
Sponsors
Del. Martha Mugler [D] | Del. Don Scott [D] | Del. Alex Askew [D] | Del. Nancy Guy [D] |
Del. Clinton Jenkins [D] | Del. Joesph Lindsey [D] | Del. Michael Mullin [D] | Del. Shelly Simonds [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-07 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0794) | |
2020-04-07 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 794 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-05 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-04 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB234ER) |
2020-03-04 | House | Enrolled |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-07 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-07 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-06 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB234H1 |
2020-02-06 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 20107171D-H1 |
2020-02-06 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-04 | House | Committee substitute printed 20107171D-H1 |
2020-02-04 | House | Reported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-16 | House | Assigned L & C sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2020-01-15 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce |
2020-01-15 | House | Referred from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote |
2019-12-29 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2019-12-29 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102566D |