VA HB2339 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0853)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Department of Taxation; sharing information with the Department of Social Services. Authorizes the Department of Taxation to share certain specified tax information with the Department of Social Services as necessary to administer public assistance and social services benefits or child support services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Taxation, Department of; sharing information with the Department of Social Services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-03 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED #2 (49-Y 49-N) (Y: 49 N: 49 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-03 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (46-Y 51-N) (Y: 46 N: 51 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (66-Y 31-N) (Y: 66 N: 31 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (9-Y 5-N 1-A) (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (58-Y 40-N) (Y: 58 N: 40 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Finance (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 1-N) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-29 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0853)
2019-04-29 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 853 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-04-03 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, May 3, 2019
2019-04-03HouseCommunicated to Governor
2019-04-03HouseVOTE: REJECTED #2 (49-Y 49-N)
2019-04-03HouseHouse rejected Governor's recommendation (49-Y 49-N)
2019-04-03HousePassed by temporarily
2019-04-03HouseReconsideration of Governor's recommendation agreed to
2019-04-03HouseVOTE: REJECTED (46-Y 51-N)
2019-04-03HouseHouse rejected Governor's recommendation (46-Y 51-N)
2019-04-03HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-03-22HouseGovernor's recommendation received by House
2019-03-04 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-04HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019
2019-02-22SenateSigned by President
2019-02-22HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-22HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2339ER)
2019-02-22HouseEnrolled
2019-02-19HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (66-Y 31-N)
2019-02-19HouseSenate substitute agreed to by House 19107154D-S1 (66-Y 31-N)
2019-02-19HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-15SenatePassed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N)
2019-02-15SenateEngrossed by Senate - floor substitute HB2339S1
2019-02-15SenateSubstitute by Senator Hanger agreed to 19107154D-S1
2019-02-15SenateReading of substitute waived
2019-02-15SenateFloor substitute printed 19107154D-S1 (Hanger)
2019-02-15SenateAmendments by Senator Hanger withdrawn
2019-02-15SenateRead third time
2019-02-14SenatePassed by for the day
2019-02-13SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2019-02-12SenateReported from Finance (9-Y 5-N 1-A)
2019-02-06SenateReferred to Committee on Finance
2019-02-06SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-02-05HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (58-Y 40-N)
2019-02-05HousePassed House (58-Y 40-N)
2019-02-05HousePassed by temporarily
2019-02-05HouseMotion to refer to Finance committee by Delegate Ware withdrawn
2019-02-05HousePassed by temporarily
2019-02-04HouseRead second time and engrossed
2019-02-01HouseRead first time
2019-01-30HouseReported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N)
2019-01-28HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2019-01-24HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #3
2019-01-21HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-21HouseReported from Finance (19-Y 3-N)
2019-01-16HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 1-N)
2019-01-15HouseAssigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #1
2019-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on Finance
2019-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103619D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
223803(n/a)See Bill Text
5813(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB2339
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2339+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2339S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2339ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0853+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H1001V0010+HB2339
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H10V0033+HB2339
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0803V0033+HB2339
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H08V0093+HB2339
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2507+HB2339
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S05V0314+HB2339
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0547HB2339+HB2339
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0710HB2339+HB2339
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3065+HB2339
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3390+HB2339
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3425+HB2339

Bill Comments

feedback