VA HB2337 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-1)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-07 - Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Sports facilities; automated external defibrillator required. Requires that every sports facility, defined in the bill, in the Commonwealth have a working automated external defibrillator.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sports facilities; automated external defibrillator required.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-07HouseLeft in Health, Welfare and Institutions
2023-01-26HouseSubcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 2-N)
2023-01-19HouseAssigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #3
2023-01-12HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2023-01-12HousePresented and ordered printed 23103855D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
32134.4(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback