VA HB2336 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0408)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0408)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Public institutions of higher education; executive officers; salaries. Requires the governing board of each public institution of higher education to report by September 1 of each year to the Chairmen of the House Committees on Appropriations and Education and the Senate Committees on Finance and Education and Health the salary by position of any executive officer of such institution that exceeds for the previous fiscal year the salary limit for the chief executive officer for such institution set forth in the general appropriation act.
Title
Higher educational institutions, public; executive officers, salaries.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 4-N) (Y: 95 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (14-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 5-N) (Y: 94 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Education with amendment (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (14-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 5-N) (Y: 94 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Education with amendment (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-14 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0408) | |
2019-03-14 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 408 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-03-04 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-03-04 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019 |
2019-02-23 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-23 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-23 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2336ER) |
2019-02-23 | House | Enrolled |
2019-02-21 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 4-N) |
2019-02-21 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 19106842D-S1 (95-Y 4-N) |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 1-N) |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB2336S1 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 19106842D-S1 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 19106842D-S1 |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (14-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Higher Education |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-02-05 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 5-N) |
2019-02-05 | House | Read third time and passed House (94-Y 5-N) |
2019-02-04 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2336H1 |
2019-02-04 | House | Committee substitute from Appropriations agreed to 19106343D-H1 |
2019-02-04 | House | Committee amendment from Education rejected |
2019-02-04 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-01 | House | Committee substitute printed 19106343D-H1 |
2019-02-01 | House | Reported from Appropriations with substitute (20-Y 1-N) |
2019-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 1-N) |
2019-01-23 | House | Assigned App. sub: Higher Education |
2019-01-23 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-01-23 | House | Reported from Education with amendment (20-Y 1-N) |
2019-01-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-01-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (7-Y 1-N) |
2019-01-18 | House | Assigned Education sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2019-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100618D |