VA HB2336 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0800)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Report of law-enforcement officer involved in accident. Provides that any law-enforcement officer who is listed as a driver in a motor vehicle accident report submitted to the Department of Motor Vehicles will not have the accident listed on his driving record if he was driving a motor vehicle provided by a law-enforcement agency in the course of his employment and was operating the motor vehicle in the performance of his official duties at the time of such accident. This bill is identical to SB 1486.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Law-enforcement officer; report of officer involved in accident.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-05 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0800)
2017-04-05HouseEnacted, Chapter 800 (effective 7/1/17)
2017-04-05SenateSigned by President as reenrolled
2017-04-05HouseSigned by Speaker as reenrolled
2017-04-05HouseReenrolled bill text (HB2336ER2)
2017-04-05HouseReenrolled
2017-04-05 Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted
2017-04-05SenateSenate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
2017-04-05HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
2017-04-05HouseHouse concurred in Governor's recommendation (98-Y 0-N)
2017-04-05HousePlaced on Calendar
2017-03-24HouseGovernor's recommendation received by House
2017-02-28 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017
2017-02-28HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/28/17
2017-02-24SenateSigned by President
2017-02-23HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-02-23HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2336ER)
2017-02-23HouseEnrolled
2017-02-20SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2017-02-20SenateReconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2017-02-20SenatePassed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2017-02-20SenateRead third time
2017-02-17SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2017-02-15SenateReported from Transportation (13-Y 0-N)
2017-02-06SenateReferred to Committee on Transportation
2017-02-06SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2017-02-03HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N)
2017-02-03HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (95-Y 0-N)
2017-02-02HousePrinted as engrossed 17103410D-E
2017-02-02HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB2336E
2017-02-02HouseCommittee amendment agreed to
2017-02-02HouseRead second time
2017-02-01HouseRead first time
2017-01-31HouseReported from Transportation with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
2017-01-23HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N)
2017-01-17HouseAssigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #2
2017-01-13HouseReferred to Committee on Transportation
2017-01-13HousePresented and ordered printed 17103410D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
462373.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+HB2336
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB2336+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB2336E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB2336ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB2336ER2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+CHAP0800+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+H1902V0015+HB2336
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+H19V0045+HB2336
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+HV1879+HB2336
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+S11V0110+HB2336
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0670HB2336+HB2336
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0694HB2336+HB2336
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0695HB2336+HB2336
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0696HB2336+HB2336
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+HV2895+HB2336
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV1179HB2336+HB2336

Bill Comments

feedback