VA HB2333 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 43-8)
Status: Enrolled on February 8 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-02-08 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2333ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Facilitate the administration of the COVID-19 vaccine; emergency. Facilitates the administration of the COVID-19 vaccine. The bill requires the Department of Health (the Department) to establish a program to enable eligible health care providers to volunteer to administer the COVID-19 vaccine to residents of the Commonwealth during a state of emergency related to the COVID-19 pandemic declared by the Governor. The bill defines "eligible health care provider" and provides that the program shall include (i) a process by which an eligible health care provider may register to participate in the program and (ii) the training requirements for participating eligible health care providers related to the administration of the COVID-19 vaccine, including training on the intramuscular injection of the COVID-19 vaccine and contraindications and side effects of the COVID-19 vaccine. The bill specifies requirements that the Department shall ensure that each site at which COVID-19 vaccinations are administered by eligible health care providers satisfies. The bill also requires the Department to establish a process by which entities, including medical care facilities, hospitals, hospital systems, corporations, businesses, pharmacies, public and private institutions of higher education, localities, and any other professional or community entity operating in the Commonwealth, may volunteer their facilities as sites at which the COVID-19 vaccine may be administered to residents of the Commonwealth. The bill permits a public institution of higher education or a private institution of higher education in the Commonwealth to volunteer to provide assistance to the Department and local health departments for data processing, analytics, and program development related to the COVID-19 vaccine through the use of its employees, students, technology, and facilities. The bill also permits localities with fire departments, emergency medical services departments, and volunteer rescue squads to establish and staff vaccine administration clinics. The bill provides civil and criminal immunity to individuals and professional entities acting pursuant to the bill and contains an emergency clause.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

COVID-19; administration of vaccine.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Amendment by Senator Dunnavant reconsidered (36-Y 1-N) (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute with amendments (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: VOTE: Agree To (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: VOTE: Agree To (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-08HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2333ER)
2021-02-08HouseEnrolled
2021-02-04HouseVOTE: Adoption #2 (99-Y 0-N)
2021-02-04HouseSenate substitute with amendments agreed to by House (99-Y 0-N)
2021-02-04HouseReconsideration of Senate substitute with amendments agreed to by House
2021-02-04HouseVOTE: Adoption (97-Y 0-N)
2021-02-04HouseSenate substitute with amendments agreed to by House 21103922D-S1 (97-Y 0-N)
2021-02-04HousePlaced on Calendar
2021-02-02SenatePassed Senate with substitute with amendments (37-Y 0-N)
2021-02-02SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendments HB2333S1
2021-02-02SenateAmendment #3 by Senator Dunnavant agreed to
2021-02-02SenateReading of amendment waived
2021-02-02SenateAmendment #2 by Senator Dunnavant rejected
2021-02-02SenateAmendment by Senator Dunnavant reconsidered (36-Y 1-N)
2021-02-02SenateReconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N)
2021-02-01SenatePassed Senate with substitute with amendments (39-Y 0-N)
2021-02-01SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendments HB2333S1
2021-02-01SenateAmendments #1 and #2 by Senator Dunnavant agreed to
2021-02-01SenateReading of amendment #2 waived
2021-02-01SenatePassed by temporarily
2021-02-01SenateReading of amendment #1 waived
2021-02-01SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 21103922D-S1
2021-02-01SenateReading of substitute waived
2021-02-01SenateRead third time
2021-01-29SenateRead second time
2021-01-28SenateCommittee substitute printed 21103922D-S1
2021-01-28SenateReported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
2021-01-27SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2021-01-27SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-01-26HouseVOTE: Passage (97-Y 0-N)
2021-01-26HousePassed House (97-Y 0-N)
2021-01-26HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB2333H1
2021-01-26HousePending question ordered
2021-01-26HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 21103636D-H1
2021-01-26HouseVOTE: Agree To (96-Y 0-N)
2021-01-26HouseConstitutional readings dispensed (96-Y 0-N)
2021-01-26HouseRead first time
2021-01-26HouseIncorporates HB2328 (Byron)
2021-01-26HouseCommittee substitute printed 21103636D-H1
2021-01-26HouseReported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2021-01-22HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2021-01-22HousePresented and ordered printed with emergency clause 21103594D

Same As/Similar To

SB1445 (Same As) 2021-02-08 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1445ER)
SB1445 (Same As) 2021-02-08 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1445ER)

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+sum+HB2333
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+HB2333+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+HB2333H1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+HB2333S1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+HB2333ER+hil
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+amd+HB2333AS
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+amd+HB2333ASE
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/21103636D.pdf
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/21103922D.pdf
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+amd+HB2333ASR
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+HB2333FS1122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H12V0061+HB2333
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+HV1112+HB2333
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+HV1113+HB2333
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+HV1171+HB2333
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+HV1172+HB2333
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+S04V0064+HB2333
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+SV0220HB2333+HB2333
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+SV0258HB2333+HB2333
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+SV0259HB2333+HB2333
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+SV0260HB2333+HB2333
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+HV1451+HB2333
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+HV1466+HB2333

Bill Comments

feedback