VA HB2332 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-12 - Governor: Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Conference Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Virginia Economic Development Partnership Authority; eligible site for site development grant; minimum acreage requirement. Reduces from 100 acres to 50 acres the minimum number of contiguous acres required for a site that is not a brownfield to satisfy the acreage requirement to be considered eligible to receive a site development grant from the Virginia Business Ready Sites Program Fund by the Virginia Economic Development Partnership Authority.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Virginia Economic Development Partnership Authority; eligible site for site development grant.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-12 - Senate - Senate: Senate rejected Governor's recommendation (17-Y 23-N) (Y: 17 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-04-12 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (94-Y 1-N) (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-12 Governor: Vetoed by Governor
2023-04-12 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., May 12, 2023
2023-04-12SenateCommunicated to Governor
2023-04-12SenateSenate rejected Governor's recommendation (17-Y 23-N)
2023-04-12HouseVOTE: Adoption (94-Y 1-N)
2023-04-12HouseHouse concurred in Governor's recommendation (94-Y 1-N)
2023-04-12HousePlaced on Calendar
2023-03-27HouseGovernor's substitute printed 23107727D-H1
2023-03-27HouseGovernor's recommendation received by House
2023-03-02 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023
2023-03-02HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 2, 2023
2023-02-24HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2332ER)
2023-02-24HouseEnrolled
2023-02-21SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2023-02-21SenateRead third time
2023-02-20SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2023-02-16SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N)
2023-02-15SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2023-02-15SenateReported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N)
2023-02-08SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2023-02-08SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2023-02-07HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N)
2023-02-07HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2023-02-06HouseRead second time and engrossed
2023-02-05HouseRead first time
2023-02-03HouseReported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N)
2023-01-31HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2023-01-31HouseReported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
2023-01-26HouseSubcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
2023-01-26HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
2023-01-23HouseAssigned GL sub: Subcommittee #1
2023-01-12HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2023-01-12HousePresented and ordered printed 23102174D
2023-01-12HouseUnanimous consent to introduce

Same As/Similar To

SB1308 (Same As) 2023-05-12 - Governor: Vetoed by Governor
SB1308 (Same As) 2023-05-12 - Governor: Vetoed by Governor

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
222240.2:1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+sum+HB2332
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+ful+HB2332+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+ful+HB2332ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+ful+HB2332H1+hil
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+amd+HB2332AG
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+oth+HB2332F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+oth+HB2332FER122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+H1101V0018+HB2332
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+H11V0054+HB2332
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+H02V0083+HB2332
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+HV1531+HB2332
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+S12V0169+HB2332
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+S05V0416+HB2332
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+SV0630HB2332+HB2332
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+SV0679HB2332+HB2332
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+HV2442+HB2332
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+SV1078HB2332+HB2332

Bill Comments

feedback