VA HB2331 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Elimination of mandatory minimum sentences; modification of sentence to mandatory minimum term of confinement for felony offenses. Eliminates mandatory minimum sentences of confinement for certain crimes. The bill also provides a petition process for a person who was convicted or adjudicated delinquent of certain felony offenses committed prior to July 1, 2021, sentenced to a mandatory minimum term of confinement for any such felony offense, and remains incarcerated in a state or local correctional facility serving the mandatory minimum term of confinement for any such felony offense to petition the circuit court that entered the original judgment or order to (i) suspend the unserved portion of such mandatory minimum sentence, (ii) place such person on probation for such time as the court shall determine, or (iii) otherwise modify the sentence imposed. The bill provides that such petition shall be filed by July 1, 2024. Elimination of mandatory minimum sentences; modification of sentence to mandatory minimum term of confinement for felony offenses. Eliminates mandatory minimum sentences of confinement for certain crimes. The bill also provides a petition process for a person who was convicted or adjudicated delinquent of certain felony offenses committed prior to July 1, 2021, sentenced to a mandatory minimum term of confinement for any such felony offense, and remains incarcerated in a state or local correctional facility serving the mandatory minimum term of confinement for any such felony offense to petition the circuit court that entered the original judgment or order to (i) suspend the unserved portion of such mandatory minimum sentence, (ii) place such person on probation for such time as the court shall determine, or (iii) otherwise modify the sentence imposed. The bill provides that such petition shall be filed by July 1, 2024.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mandatory minimum sentences; elimination, modification of sentence to mandatory minimum term.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (58-Y 42-N) (Y: 58 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (14-Y 8-N) (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment(s) (13-Y 7-N) (Y: 13 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N)
2021-02-05SenateReferred to Committee on the Judiciary
2021-02-05SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-02-05HouseVOTE: Passage (58-Y 42-N)
2021-02-05HouseRead third time and passed House (58-Y 42-N)
2021-02-05HousePending question ordered
2021-02-04HousePrinted as engrossed 21103590D-E
2021-02-04HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB2331E
2021-02-04HouseCommittee amendments agreed to
2021-02-04HouseRead second time
2021-02-03HouseRead first time
2021-02-03HouseReported from Appropriations (14-Y 8-N)
2021-02-01HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N)
2021-01-29HouseAssigned App. sub: Transportation & Public Safety
2021-01-29HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2021-01-29HouseReported from Courts of Justice with amendment(s) (13-Y 7-N)
2021-01-22HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2021-01-22HousePresented and ordered printed 21103590D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
182186.4(n/a)See Bill Text
182248(n/a)See Bill Text
182248.01(n/a)See Bill Text
182248.03(n/a)See Bill Text
182248.1(n/a)See Bill Text
182248.5(n/a)See Bill Text
182255(n/a)See Bill Text
182255.2(n/a)See Bill Text
192303.03(n/a)See Bill Text
324212(n/a)See Bill Text
41302(n/a)See Bill Text
462357(n/a)See Bill Text
462391(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+sum+HB2331
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+HB2331+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+HB2331E+hil
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+amd+HB2331AH
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/21104020A.pdf
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+HB2331F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+HB2331FE122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H08V0135+HB2331
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H0207V0017+HB2331
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H02V0106+HB2331
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+HV1511+HB2331
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+S03V0156+HB2331

Bill Comments

feedback