VA HB2328 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Governor: Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Virginia Public Procurement Act; proscribed subcontracting by certain small businesses. Prohibits a small business from subcontracting with any other business with which it has an affiliated business entity relationship if such small business (i) has been awarded a contract by a public body as part of an enhancement or remedial measure authorized by the Governor and (ii) the award of such contract is conditioned upon the small business's qualification as part of a subcategory of small businesses established as part of the enhancement program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Virginia Public Procurement Act; proscribed subcontracting by certain small businesses.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-03 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (48-Y 49-N) (Y: 48 N: 49 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03 Governor: Vetoed by Governor
2019-04-03 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, May 3, 2019
2019-04-03HouseCommunicated to Governor
2019-04-03HouseVOTE: REJECTED (48-Y 49-N)
2019-04-03HouseHouse rejected Governor's recommendation (48-Y 49-N)
2019-04-03HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-03-26HouseGovernor's recommendation received by House
2019-02-21 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-21HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 21, 2019
2019-02-20SenateSigned by President
2019-02-19HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-19HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2328ER)
2019-02-19HouseEnrolled
2019-02-14SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-14SenateRead third time
2019-02-13SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2019-02-11SenateReported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N)
2019-01-31SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2019-01-31SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-01-30HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
2019-01-30HouseRead third time and passed House (98-Y 0-N)
2019-01-29HouseRead second time and engrossed
2019-01-28HouseRead first time
2019-01-24HouseReported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
2019-01-22HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2019-01-16HouseAssigned GL sub: Subcommittee #4
2019-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2019-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100871D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
224376.2(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback