VA HB2327 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0623)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0623)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
DUI; implied consent; refusal of blood or breath tests. Eliminates the criminal penalties for refusing to submit to a blood test to determine the alcohol or drug content of a defendant's blood upon arrest for a DUI-related offense under the law on implied consent. The bill also increases to a Class 1 misdemeanor the criminal penalty for refusing to submit to a breath test under the law on implied consent for an offense committed within 10 years of a prior offense of refusal or of another DUI-related offense. The bill also extends to blood tests performed by the Department of Forensic Science pursuant to a search warrant the rebuttable presumption that a person is intoxicated based on the person's blood alcohol level demonstrated by such tests. The bill also provides that an application for a search warrant to perform a blood test on a person suspected of committing a DUI-related offense shall be given priority over other matters pending before the judge or magistrate. Finally, the bill establishes a rebuttable presumption applicable in a civil case for punitive damages for injuries caused by an intoxicated driver that a person who has consumed alcohol knew or should have known that his ability to drive was or would be impaired by such consumption. This bill is in response to the U.S. Supreme Court decision in Birchfield v. North Dakota, 136 S. Ct. 2160 (2016). The bill contains an emergency clause.
Title
Driving under influence of alcohol; implied consent, refusal of blood or breath tests.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION EMERGENCY (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE EMERGENCY (96-Y 1-N) (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE EMERGENCY (96-Y 1-N) (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-16 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0623) | |
2017-03-16 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 623 (effective 3/16/17) | |
2017-02-28 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-02-28 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/28/17 |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-24 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-24 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2327ER) |
2017-02-24 | House | Enrolled |
2017-02-21 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION EMERGENCY (97-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-21 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 17105455D-S1 (97-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-21 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB2327S1 |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 17105455D-S1 |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 17105455D-S1 |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2017-02-07 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE EMERGENCY (96-Y 1-N) |
2017-02-07 | House | Read third time and passed House (96-Y 1-N) |
2017-02-06 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2327H1 |
2017-02-06 | House | Emergency clause added |
2017-02-06 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 17105153D-H1 |
2017-02-06 | House | Read second time |
2017-02-04 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-03 | House | Committee substitute printed 17105153D-H1 |
2017-02-03 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (20-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (11-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-23 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law |
2017-01-13 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2017-01-13 | House | Presented and ordered printed 17100553D |
Subjects
Administration of Government
Crimes and Offenses Generally
Drunk Driving
Emergency Legislation
Motor Vehicles
Crimes and Offenses Generally
Drunk Driving
Emergency Legislation
Motor Vehicles
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 2 | 1627 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 228 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 241 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 278.8 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 278.9 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 309 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 268.10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 268.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 268.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 268.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 268.9 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 269 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 272 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 52 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 73 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 511 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
29 | 1 | 738.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
29 | 1 | 738.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 2099.49 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 301.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 341.26:10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 341.26:2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 341.26:3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 341.26:4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 341.26:9 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 341.27 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 391 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 391.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 391.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
8 | 01 | 44.5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |