VA HB2326 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2326
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Regulation of child-care services in localities. Expands to include all cities the authority related to the regulation of child-care services that is currently available to certain Northern Virginia localities. This will have the effect of granting all cities authority by ordinance to regulate child-care facilities that provide regular care to one or more children not related by blood or marriage.
Title
Child-care services; regulation in localities.
Sponsors
Sen. Angelia Williams Graves [D] | Del. Shelly Simonds [D] | Del. C.E. Hayes [D] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] |
Del. Mark Levine [D] | Del. Sam Rasoul [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Local Government (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (56-Y 43-N) (Y: 56 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (14-Y 8-N) (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 2-N) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (56-Y 43-N) (Y: 56 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (14-Y 8-N) (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 2-N) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Local Government (15-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-02-03 | House | VOTE: Passage (56-Y 43-N) |
2021-02-03 | House | Read third time and passed House (56-Y 43-N) |
2021-02-02 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2021-02-01 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-29 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (14-Y 8-N) |
2021-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 2-N) |
2021-01-26 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Land Use |
2021-01-22 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2021-01-22 | House | Presented and ordered printed 21103144D |
Same As/Similar To
HB2326 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Local Government (15-Y 0-N)