VA HB2326 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Registration of specially constructed vehicles for general transportation purposes. Provides a process by which the Department of Motor Vehicles may register specially constructed vehicles that do not meet requirements for on-road use to operate on the highways of the Commonwealth for general transportation purposes. Such vehicles may be operated only on an intrastate basis and must have a valid Virginia safety inspection. The owner of such specially constructed vehicle must complete an acknowledgement that such vehicle may not be operated on an interstate basis. Such vehicles do not have to meet Federal Motor Vehicle Safety Standards.
Title
Specially constructed vehicles for general transportation purposes; registration.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-07 | House | Left in Transportation |
2017-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2017-01-17 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #4 |
2017-01-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2017-01-13 | House | Presented and ordered printed 17103352D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
46 | 2 | 100 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 602.5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 711 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+HB2326 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB2326+hil |