VA HB2323 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Clerks; refusal to record certain liens or encumbrances. Provides that a clerk may refuse to record a lien or encumbrance filed by a person previously convicted of filing a false lien or encumbrance, provided that such lien or encumbrance to be recorded is the same or substantially similar to the lien or encumbrance that led to such person's conviction. The bill further allows a clerk to refuse to record a lien or encumbrance if the clerk reasonably believes such lien or encumbrance is being filed maliciously. The bill provides that the person attempting to file such lien or encumbrance shall receive written notice of such refusal and an opportunity to be heard as to why such lien or encumbrance is not malicious.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Clerks; refusal to record certain liens or encumbrances.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-05HouseLeft in Courts of Justice
2019-01-16HouseSubcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 0-N)
2019-01-15HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #2
2019-01-08HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102279D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
171223(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback