VA HB2322 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB2322
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0306)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0306)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Opioid Abatement Authority; established; report. Establishes the Opioid Abatement Authority. The Authority, with the assistance of the Office of the Attorney General, would administer the Opioid Abatement Fund, which would receive moneys from settlements, judgments, verdicts, and other court orders relating to claims regarding the manufacturing, marketing, distribution, or sale of opioids and any other funds received on the Fund's behalf that would be used to provide grants and loans to Virginia agencies and certain localities for the purpose of treating, preventing, or reducing opioid use disorder and the misuse of opioids or otherwise abating or remediating the opioid epidemic in the Commonwealth.
Title
Opioid Abatement Authority; established, Fund created, report, membership.
Sponsors
Del. Charniele Herring [D] | Del. Eileen Filler-Corn [D] | Del. Dawn Adams [D] | Sen. Lamont Bagby [D] |
Del. Nancy Guy [D] | Del. Kathleen Murphy [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (94-Y 5-N) (Y: 94 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute with amendment (36-Y 0-N 3-A) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute with amendment (37-Y 0-N 2-A) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (97-Y 3-N) (Y: 97 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute with amendment (36-Y 0-N 3-A) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute with amendment (37-Y 0-N 2-A) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (97-Y 3-N) (Y: 97 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-24 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0306) | |
2021-03-24 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 306 (effective 7/1/21) | |
2021-03-15 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021 | |
2021-03-15 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 15, 2021 |
2021-03-11 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-03-09 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2322ER) |
2021-03-09 | House | Enrolled |
2021-02-25 | House | VOTE: Adoption (94-Y 5-N) |
2021-02-25 | House | Senate substitute with amendment agreed to by House 21200424D-S1 (94-Y 5-N) |
2021-02-25 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute with amendment (36-Y 0-N 3-A) |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute with amendment (37-Y 0-N 2-A) |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendment HB2322S1 |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Amendment by Senator Barker agreed to |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 21200424D-S1 |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Read third time |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 21200424D-S1 |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (12-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-02-04 | House | VOTE: Passage (97-Y 3-N) |
2021-02-04 | House | Read third time and passed House (97-Y 3-N) |
2021-02-03 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2322H2 |
2021-02-03 | House | Committee on Appropriations substitute agreed to 21104247D-H2 |
2021-02-03 | House | Committee on General Laws substitute rejected 21103991D-H1 |
2021-02-03 | House | Read second time |
2021-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-01 | House | Committee substitute printed 21104247D-H2 |
2021-02-01 | House | Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-29 | House | Assigned App. sub: Compensation & General Government |
2021-01-28 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2021-01-28 | House | Committee substitute printed 21103991D-H1 |
2021-01-28 | House | Reported from General Laws with substitute (20-Y 2-N) |
2021-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2021-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) |
2021-01-27 | House | Assigned GL sub: Professions/Occupations and Administrative Process |
2021-01-21 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2021-01-21 | House | Presented and ordered printed 21103485D |
Same As/Similar To
HB2322 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
SB1469 (Same As) 2021-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0307)
SB1469 (Same As) 2021-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0307)
SB1469 (Same As) 2021-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0307)
SB1469 (Same As) 2021-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0307)
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 2 | 212 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2365 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2376 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 507.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
51 | 1 | 124.40 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |