VA HB2322 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2322
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Opioid Abatement Authority; established, report. Establishes the Opioid Abatement Authority. The Authority, with the assistance of the Office of the Attorney General, would administer the Opioid Abatement Fund, which would receive moneys from settlements, judgments, verdicts, and other court orders relating to claims regarding the manufacturing, marketing, distribution, or sale of opioids and any other funds received on the fund's behalf that would be used to provide grants and loans to Virginia agencies and certain localities for the purpose of treating, preventing, or reducing opioid use disorder and the misuse of opioids or otherwise abating or remediating the opioid epidemic in the Commonwealth. Opioid Abatement Authority; established, report. Establishes the Opioid Abatement Authority. The Authority, with the assistance of the Office of the Attorney General, would administer the Opioid Abatement Fund, which would receive moneys from settlements, judgments, verdicts, and other court orders relating to claims regarding the manufacturing, marketing, distribution, or sale of opioids and any other funds received on the fund's behalf that would be used to provide grants and loans to Virginia agencies and certain localities for the purpose of treating, preventing, or reducing opioid use disorder and the misuse of opioids or otherwise abating or remediating the opioid epidemic in the Commonwealth.
Title
Opioid Abatement Authority; established, report.
Sponsors
Del. Charniele Herring [D] | Del. Eileen Filler-Corn [D] | Del. Dawn Adams [D] | Sen. Lamont Bagby [D] |
Del. Nancy Guy [D] | Del. Kathleen Murphy [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (97-Y 3-N) (Y: 97 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (97-Y 3-N) (Y: 97 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-02-04 | House | VOTE: Passage (97-Y 3-N) |
2021-02-04 | House | Read third time and passed House (97-Y 3-N) |
2021-02-03 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2322H2 |
2021-02-03 | House | Committee on Appropriations substitute agreed to 21104247D-H2 |
2021-02-03 | House | Committee on General Laws substitute rejected 21103991D-H1 |
2021-02-03 | House | Read second time |
2021-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-01 | House | Committee substitute printed 21104247D-H2 |
2021-02-01 | House | Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-29 | House | Assigned App. sub: Compensation & General Government |
2021-01-28 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2021-01-28 | House | Committee substitute printed 21103991D-H1 |
2021-01-28 | House | Reported from General Laws with substitute (20-Y 2-N) |
2021-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2021-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) |
2021-01-27 | House | Assigned GL sub: Professions/Occupations and Administrative Process |
2021-01-21 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2021-01-21 | House | Presented and ordered printed 21103485D |
Same As/Similar To
HB2322 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 2 | 212 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2365 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2376 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 507.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
51 | 1 | 124.40 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |