VA HB2322 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Criminal Justice Services Board. Replaces the member representing the Virginia Crime Prevention Association with a member representing the Virginia Association of Campus Law Enforcement Administrators since the Virginia Crime Prevention Association is no longer in existence.
Title
Criminal Justice Services Board; citizen membership.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-07 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2017-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2017-01-16 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law |
2017-01-13 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2017-01-13 | House | Presented and ordered printed 17103674D |
Subjects
Commissions Boards and Institutions Generally
Commonwealth Public Safety
Criminal Justice Services
Criminal Procedure
Commonwealth Public Safety
Criminal Justice Services
Criminal Procedure
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+HB2322 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB2322+hil |